Top 10 Math Shortcut Tricks

Top 10 Math Shortcut Tricks

Top 10 Maths Shortcut Tricks

INTRODUCTION:-

Mathematics is the cradle of all creations, without which the world cannot move an inch, money, etc. It is a skill, a subject, which is taught in school from class 1 to 10. Generally, Mathematics

requires methodical and logical thinking and a lot of regular practice to master it. Mathematics is a fundamental part of human thought and logic, and integral to attempts at understanding the world and ourselves. Mathematics provides an effective
way of building mental discipline and encouraging methodical and mental rigor.

The question arises when Mathematics is mandatory in every field also why do scholars sweat Mathematics? What’s the reason behind it?  Archimedes is extensively regarded as one of the topmost Mathematicians in history, earning him the title of the” “Father of Mathematics.

 

 

 

 

Why Do Students Fear Of Mathematics

  1. Lack Of Attention
    2  Lack Of Understanding
    3  .Lack of self-Esteem
    4.  Limited    conginitive ability
    attention Deficit
    5. Distinct Methods And Approach
    6 . Encouraging  Students To Make Their Own Notes
    7  .Positive Attitude Towards Mathematics
    8  .Mathematics learning difficulty
    9.  Lack of Analogies
    10. Best Relationship Between Student And Teacher
    11  Inability to solve home assignment    

How To Overcome Mathematics Phobia

It is fair to say that Mathematics is not everyone’s Favourite Subject.

1. .BE POSITIVE
2. FACE IT SQAURELY
3. FIND OUT THE ROOT CAUSE
4. ENCOURAGE PRACTICE
5. MAKE MATHS SIMPLE AND FUN
6. REGULAR PRACTICES
7. ENCOURAGE PEERLEARNING
8. SET AN EXAMPLE
K.K.Institute an online as well as offline platform offering educational videos and exercises in different content areas, has awakened intense interest among foundations, and educators about how this tool can help meet the educational challenges facing countries around the world. In August 2015, We found that the way functions as a digital learning environment changes the ways and the degree to which students engage with and are engaged by the math content; it also changes the way teachers and students interact with each other. Even though the use of K.K.Institute may plant the seeds of deeper pedagogical changes such as mastery learning or differentiated instruction, teachers did not need to change their entire teaching model to start using it. K.K.Institute the straightforward approach of providing an endless bank of practice exercises makes it an inviting and universally adaptable tool across different types of teachers, classrooms, and countries.

To overcome fear Institute has brought shortcut Tricks to solve mathematics.

Maths tricks are the ways to solve complex mathematical problems easily and quickly. Mathematics is not only limited to learning from textbooks, different learning styles are easier. Simple Maths magic tricks help us with fast calculations and improve our mathematical skills. For example, the multiplication tricks will help students to learn math tables and quick multiplication.

1. Squaring Of A Number Whose Unit Digit Is 5
One of the magic tricks that answer how to calculate fast is the squaring of a number whose unit digit is 5. You can quickly compute the square of a two-digit number that ends with 5. Irrespective of the syllabus you are studying (be it CBSE or ICSE), you will certainly come across such sums. For instance, to calculate (55)² =?

Step 1. Multiply 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)

Step 2. Take 5x (5+1) = 30

. Multiply a Number By 5

One of the popular magic tricks is multiplying a number by 5. Multiplying any number by 5 can be done with a simple trick that reduces the time it takes to do the calculation. To multiply an even number by 5, simply divide the number by 2 and then add a 0 to the end of the result. For example, 2464 x 5 = 24640 (2464/2 = 1232, 1232 + 0 = 12320). To multiply an odd number by 5, subtract 1 from the number, divide it by 2, and add a 5 to the end of the result. For example, 3775 x 5 = 18875 (3775–1 = 1874, 1874/2 = 1887, 1887 + 5 = 18875). To test your knowledge, try 1234 x 5 = 6170 and 123 x 5 = 615.

Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000

While subtractions from 1000s seem difficult, magic tricks make it easier. To subtract a number from 100’s multiple such as 1000, 10000, etc. quickly, one could employ the Vedic Math Tricks. For example, to subtract 1000–573, one could subtract each figure in 573 from 9 and then subtract the last figure from 10. Step 1. 9–5 = 4, Step 2. 9–7 = 2, Step 3. 10–3 = 7. Thus, the answer is: (1000–573) = 427. Here are some practice sums for you to try using this technique: 1000–857, 10,000–1029, 10,000–1264, and 1000–336.

Multiplication Of Any 2-digit Numbers (11–19)

One of the beneficial magic tricks for multiplication is to multiply any two-digit number from 11 to 19 quickly and accurately, employing this Vedic Trick. After a few times of practicing, you will be able to calculate faster than a calculator.

Follow these 4 steps:

Step 1: Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number.

Step 2: Multiply the result by 10.

Step 3: Multiply the unit digits of the numbers.

Step 4: Add the two numbers.

For instance, when multiplying 13 and 15, the answer is 195:

Step 1: 15 + 3 = 18.

Step 2: 18 * 10 = 180.

Step 3: 3 * 5 = 15.

Step 4: Add 180 + 15 = 195.

5.

ividing A Large Number By 5

One of the effective maths tricks is to divide a large number by 5.

To find the answer for 16951/5:

Step 1: 16951 * 2 = 33902

Step 2: Move the decimal: 3390.2 or just 3390

To find the answer for 2112/5:

Step 1: 2112 * 2 = 4224

Step 2: Move the decimal: 422.4 or just 422

To find the answer for 4731/5:

Step 1: 4731 * 2 = 9462

Step 2: Move the decimal: 946.2 or just 946

6.

Multiply Any Two-digit Number By 11

One of the maths tricks for fast calculation is to finish a multiplication problem in only 2 seconds. Examples such as 32 x 11 = 352, 52 x 11 = 572, and 35 x 11 = 385 demonstrate how this method works. Why not give it a go with 19*11 and 18*11 to see if you can get the same results?

7.

Multiplication Of Any 3-digit Numbers

For 808 and 806, subtract the last 2 digits from the actual number:

808–8=800

806–6=800

Select any number and add the last 2 digits of the other number:

808 + 6 = 814

Multiply the product of Step 2 and Step 1: 814 x 800 = 651200

The last 2 digits of both numbers are 8 & 6. The product of these two numbers: 8 x 6 = 48

Last step: 651200 + 48 = 651248

Therefore, 808 x 806 = 651248

For 536 and 504, subtract the last 2 digits from the actual number:

536–36=500

504–4=500

Select any number and add the last 2 digits of the other number:

536 + 4 = 540

Multiply the product of Step 2 and Step 1: 540 x 500 = 270000

The last 2 digits of both numbers are 36 & 4. The product of these two numbers: 36 x 4 = 144

Last step: 270000 + 144 = 270144

Therefore, 536 x 504 = 270144

Note — This Rule is applicable when the Hundredths Place digit is the same in both numbers such as 209 and 223 Or say 408 and 450 Or 620 and 664.

Find The Square Value

Calculating the square of a number using the Vedic Maths Trick is straightforward. To do so, take the following steps:

Step 1. Select a base close to the original number.

Step 2. Calculate the difference between the original number and the base.

Step 3. Add the original number and the difference.

Step 4. Multiply the result of Step 3 by the base.

Step 5. Add the square of the difference with the result of Step 4. For example, to find the square of 99:

Step 1. Choose 100 as the base.

Step 2. Difference: 99–100 = -1

Step 3. Add the number with the difference = 99 + (-1) = 98

Step 4. Multiply the result with the base = 98 * 100 = 9800

Step 5. Add the product of the square of the difference = 9800 + (-1)² = 9801

Therefore, (99)² = 9801.

You can also try it for (98)², (97)², (102)², (101)² to practice.

 Multiply any large number by 12

Simply multiply the last digit of any number by 12 before doubling each digit after that and adding them together.

For instance, 13243 * 12 =

Let’s decompose it into manageable steps:

Step 1: Multiply 13243 by 12 to get ___ (Double of last digit 3).

Step 2: Take 13243 x 12 to get 16 (now multiply 4 by 8 to get 8 Plus 3 to obtain 11; 1 will carry over).

Step 3: 13243 x 12 = ___916 (Now multiply 2 by 4 to get 4 + 4 + 1 to get 9)

Step 4. 13243* 12= 8916 (Now multiply 3 by 2 to get 6, and add 6 to 2 to get 8)

Step 5. 13243 * 12= 58916 (Now multiply 1 by 2 and multiply it by 3 to get 5)

Step 6. 13243 * 12= 158916 (Now multiply 0 by 2 and add 1 to get 0+1=2)

10. Convert Kg to Pounds

10. Conversion of Kilograms to Pounds

Conversion of Kilograms to Pounds

Here’s an illustration: 112 kg to pounds conversion.

Step 1: Double the kilogram value by two (112X2)= 224

2. Divide the preceding number by 10

(224/10 = 22.4).

3. Add the two numbers together: 224 + 22.4 Equals 246.4 pounds.

We hope that these Vedic math tips can help you swiftly answer arithmetic issues. But when it comes to Vedic mathematics, there are always more tricks to learn.

So Try These Tricks and if you again find any problem you can contact us through our website k.k.institute.co.in or you can write a mail to us. Thanks.

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Ut elit tellus, luctus nec ullamcorper mattis, pulvinar dapibus leo.

Leave a Comment

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *

Scroll to Top
Call Now Button